U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04271-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ndam
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 08, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.