U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02565-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2020: [Detention]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 09, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.