U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04298-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2021: [Detention]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.