U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02566-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 28, 2020: [Order]
  • December 28, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 23, 2020: [Detention]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 22, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.