U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neill
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 03, 2021: [Release from Custody]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.