U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02644-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gross et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2021: [Detention]
  • January 11, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.