U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00005
  • Case Name: Whipple v. Laurel County Correctional Center et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.