U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortega
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2021: [Detention]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.