U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02690-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Prime et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • April 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 31, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify (Other)]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 11, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2021: [Modify (Other)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 03, 2021: [Detention]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • January 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.