U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weaver
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Public Docket Annotation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • January 28, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • January 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • January 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 21, 2021: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • January 21, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 21, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.