U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ferk
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Exhibit Withdrawal]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice Regarding Exhibit Withdrawal]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Travel]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Filing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • May 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2021: [Transcript]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2021: [Bond ]
  • January 28, 2021: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • January 27, 2021: [Proposed Sealed Document]
  • January 27, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • January 26, 2021: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 21, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.