U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mc-00003
  • Case Name: Denton v. Boyd
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • February 11, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • January 22, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.