U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02676-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Protective Order]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2021: [Detention]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.