U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02583-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.