U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02752-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.