U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02732-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 05, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • February 23, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 23, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 08, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 05, 2021: [Detention]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.