U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • February 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2021: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • February 08, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.