U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buford
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.