U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02739-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2021: [Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.