U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Petty
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order of Competency to Stand Trial ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 04, 2022: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 10, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.