U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04259-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.