U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parks
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 04, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • March 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2021: [Modify (Other)]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.