U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-04003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fitts, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.