U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anguiano et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
  • March 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 18, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 10, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.