U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HALEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 11, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 12, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • February 12, 2021: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.