U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 16, 2021: [Extend]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2021: [Detention]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.