U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02785-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 05, 2021: [Suppress]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 26, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • March 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 03, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.