U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02538-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 16, 2021: [Extend]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.