U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02798-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gray
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • March 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • March 04, 2021: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.