U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.