U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02795-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.