U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stone
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 06, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.