U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-04022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Higueros
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • May 14, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.