U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walters
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2021: [Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2021: [Revoke]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 08, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.