U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00011
  • Case Name: Frost v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2021: [Supplement]
  • April 09, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 09, 2021: [Petition]
  • April 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Support (non-motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.