U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 09, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • April 09, 2021: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.