U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dolan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 21, 2021: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 21, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.