U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-mc-00001
  • Case Name: Gay v. State of Tennessee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Case Transferred Out - District Transfer]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Transferring Case to Other District]
  • April 30, 2021: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.