U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04256-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Al-Amin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.