U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kumssa
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.