U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-04070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2021: [Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 27, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 20, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2021: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.