U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02823-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hale
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 07, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.