U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02824-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hampton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 12, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.