U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandridge
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 18, 2021: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • May 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.