U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nanney et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 21, 2021: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • May 21, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.