U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-01080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Randall
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2021: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.