U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02826-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vaughn
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.