U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02903-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.