U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-02810-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Welling
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Modify (Other)]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.