U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00009
  • Case Name: SmileDirectClub, LLC v. Align Technology, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • July 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 20, 2021: [Clarify]
  • July 13, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.